SETTLE AREA SWIMMING POOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Settle and the surrounding area the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Hirst | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dryburgh | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ken Larkins | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Anne Galloway | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Smith | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Orton | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSIE SANDERSON | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £426.96k | £224.28k | £416.55k | £461.43k | £446.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.99k | £232.48k | £260.85k | £411.38k | £511.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.08k | £161.96k | £139.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SETTLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Settle Swimming Pool
Giggleswick
SETTLE
BD24 0BU
- Phone:
- 01729823626
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window