NEH (NORTH EAST HOMELESS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity united by our passion to make a difference. We vow to help create change by making a better living conditions for the homeless and vulnerable of the North East. We also support those who are financially vulnerable and in danger of homelessness and their families. The support we provide is holistic, person centred through accessing practical none prescriptive projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 17 November 2016: CIO registration
- 28 November 2023: Funds received from 1100971 NORTH EAST HELP LINK TRUST LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jayne Little | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Clarke | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2018 | 06/04/2019 | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.62k | £31.71k | £103.81k | £408.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.01k | £16.16k | £43.16k | £149.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | |||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | |||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | |||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | |||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MATERIAL ITEMS SUCH AS FOOD AND CLOTHING (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) AND OUTREACH PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO VULNERABLE INDIVIDUALS, TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR LIFESTYLES AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT AND TO SHOW EMPATHY AND SYMPATHY TO SUCH VULNERABLE PEOPLE SO THAT THEY FEEL VALUED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3a3 Northumberland Street
North Shields
NE30 1DS
- Phone:
- 0794857130
- Email:
- northeasthomeless@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window