THE DEVON AND EXETER INSTITUTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of public education particularly in the History, Literature and Arts of the County of Devon, City of Exeter and of the South West of England generally and particularly by the provision and maintenance of a Library, Readiong Rooms and educational facilities and the advancement of heritage by the preservation of number 7 Cathedral Close Exeter for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 07 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Mayon-White | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Andrew Mark Staniford | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise McCracken | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mitchell | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Emily Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Morgane | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Colin Higgins | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth O'Neale | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Henry Richards French | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.86k | £164.19k | £1.07m | £970.82k | £105.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.45k | £162.58k | £190.79k | £177.05k | £189.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.43k | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £24.67k | £16.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £16.76k | £18.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.03m | £935.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £5 | £37 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £190.79k | £177.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.51k | £1.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION PARTICULARLY IN THE HISTORY, LITERATURE AND ARTS OF THE COUNTY OF DEVON, THE CITY OF EXETER AND OF THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND GENERALLY AND PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A LIBRARY, READING ROOMS AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HERITAGE BY THE PRESERVATION OF NUMBER 7 CATHEDRAL CLOSE, EXETER, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND VALUE.
Linked charities
- 07 November 1989 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEVON & EXETER INSTITUTION
7 CATHEDRAL CLOSE
EXETER
EX1 1EZ
- Phone:
- 07725801673
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window