THE LAPWINGS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Events and activities are undertaken within the WI regulations, to provide women with educational opportunities and to build new skills, to campaign on important issues that matter to them and their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 17 November 2016: Standard registration
- LAPWINGS WI (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Arnold | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Heath Tilford | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAN CARRIER | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JO OLDHAM | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN WHYTE | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATH HOWARD | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET IRENE HUCKERBY | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
TERESA MARGARET HOGG | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Caroline Stevenson | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|||||
JOANNA MARGARET PARRIS | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.16k | £6.59k | £14.33k | £14.49k | £21.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.54k | £7.15k | £12.43k | £13.96k | £21.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUN 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 ETHEL AVENUE
HUCKNALL
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 8DB
- Phone:
- 07807326517
- Email:
- lapwingssecretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window