THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PELSALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 20 December 2016: Standard registration
- THE PCC OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, PELSALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALISON MARY MORRIS | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Legg | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Read | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN ENID BETHELL | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McCullum | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elaine Elizabeth Foxall | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lloyd | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annetta Margaret Horton | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BRIGGS | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jill Welch | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Maye | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Chantler | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE MORRIS | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Myatt | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.53k | £65.46k | £72.93k | £97.77k | £111.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.55k | £73.34k | £73.26k | £61.14k | £71.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £150 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Chestnut Road
Walsall
WS3 1BD
- Phone:
- 01922 477734
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window