Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PELSALL
Charity number: 1170860
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALISON MARY MORRIS | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McCullum | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annetta Margaret Horton | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BRIGGS | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jill Welch | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN ENID BETHELL | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Legg | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David William Allabarton | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lloyd | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Read | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Maye | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elaine Elizabeth Foxall | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Chantler | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE MORRIS | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Myatt | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.