Trustees THEHORSECOURSE
Charity number: 1170553

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA ROSE-PRYNN | Chair | 14 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
Martin Roy Forbes Hirst | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lynch | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Simon Cole | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Eaton | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justine Louise Davie | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.