THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHEADLE ALL HALLOWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the mission of the Church of England, by including evangelism, social and ecumenical means. Promotes Christianity by encouraging non church members to participate in events aimed at non church members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £4,063 from 3 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stockport
Governance
- 12 January 2017: Standard registration
- THE PARISH OF CHEADLE ALL HALLOWS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL JAMES CUMMING | Chair | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARKHAM | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Brooke | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Godfrey | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY LESLIE PRIEST | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Laren Hewitt | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Holt | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Miles | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gillian Helen Hall | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Catherine Jane Johnson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Theophanous | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HARRISON | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL WILSON | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY BAILEY | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY TURNER | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JACKSON FORREST | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MASON | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIANE EATON | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.10k | £76.15k | £100.31k | £129.35k | £160.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.87k | £116.05k | £144.44k | £145.10k | £173.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.88k | N/A | £4.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, INCLUDING EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL MATTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
222 COUNCILLOR LANE
CHEADLE
SK8 2JG
- Phone:
- 01614788789
- Email:
- allhallows.cheadle@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window