ST SEBASTIAN'S PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PERMIT THE PARISHIONERS OF ST SEBASTIAN'S PARISH THE USE OF THE LAND HELD BY THE TRUST FOR THE PLAYING OF ORGANISED GAMES AND IN PARTICULAR THE GAME OF CRICKET AND FOR ANY OTHER LIKE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Wokingham
Governance
- 26 January 2017: CIO registration
- 05 February 2018: Funds received from 294719 ST SEBASTIAN'S PLAYING FIELD TRUST
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANDREW HALL | Chair | 01 January 1994 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Smith | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALAN WOLTON | Trustee | 01 June 1994 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.01k | £7.43k | £12.45k | £9.51k | £11.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £521 | £15.41k | £12.34k | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2023 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2023 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2023 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2023 | 541 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 443 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 443 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE RESIDENT IN THE LOCAL AREAS OF WOKINGHAM AND CROWTHORNE TO FACILITATE THE USE OF LOCAL LAND FOR THE PLAYING OF ORGANISED GAMES AND IN PARTICULAR THE GAME OF CRICKET AND FOR ANY OTHER LIKE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Sebastian's Playing Field Trust
St. Sebastians Close
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG40 3XA
- Phone:
- 07917753200
- Email:
- partridgedan@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window