AID FOR HIMALAYAN EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently supporting the provision of educational opportunities for people from the Himalayan regions, particularly the young people of Spiti, Himachal Pradesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 08 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM CHARLES WOODHOUSE | Chair | 17 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Penelope Ann Halnan | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN PATRICK WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICK MACAULAY SUTHERLAND | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY NICHOLS | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.18k | £16.65k | £18.91k | £25.51k | £20.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.44k | £17.85k | £17.87k | £22.80k | £21.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE HIMALAYAN REGIONS OF INDIA, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM SPITI, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 SOUTH STREET
CHESTER
CH3 5DR
- Phone:
- +33610875205
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window