CHRISTIAN DELIVERANCE STUDY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We train people (usually clergy) in deliverance ministry. Largely speaking we work with Church of England Clergy, but at our annual training course we usually have one or two people from overseas, or from other denominations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Ernest McDonald | Chair | 15 November 2016 |
|
|||
REV HOWARD NEIL GILBERT BA BTH | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04k | £28.22k | £4.54k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.76k | £14.73k | £10.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2022 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2022 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BELIEFS OF THE CHURCHES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE CHURCH IN WALES (“THE CHURCHES”), AS EXPRESSED IN THE DOCTRINES AND CANONS OF THE SAME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) SUPPORTING THE NETWORK OF ANGLICAN ADVISERS IN THE FIELD OF DELIVERANCE MINISTRY (AS DEFINED IN SCHEDULE 1) WITHIN THE CHURCHES, TO SHARE AND AGREE GOOD PRACTICE. GOOD PRACTICE SHALL INCLUDE (BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO) THE ADOPTION OF APPROPRIATE POLICIES AND PRACTICES TO ENSURE THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN AND VULNERABLE ADULTS, ENCOURAGING THOSE IN NEED OR BELIEVED TO BE IN NEED OF MEDICAL CARE TO SEEK APPROPRIATE CLINICAL PROFESSIONALS, AND TO WORK COLLABORATIVELY WITH HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND STATUTORY AGENCIES WHERE APPROPRIATE. B) ARRANGING CONFERENCES AND TRAINING EVENTS FOR THOSE APPOINTED BY THEIR BISHOPS, OR IN THE CASE OF OTHER CHRISTIAN DENOMINATIONS APPROPRIATE ECCLESIASTICAL AUTHORITY, TO EXERCISE DELIVERANCE MINISTRY IN THE CHURCHES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN DENOMINATIONS. C) PUBLISHING LITERATURE AND GUIDELINES PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE WITHIN THE FIELD OF DELIVERANCE MINISTRY. GOOD PRACTICE SHALL INCLUDE (BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO) THE ADOPTION OF APPROPRIATE POLICIES AND PRACTICES TO ENSURE THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN AND VULNERABLE ADULTS, AND ENCOURAGING THOSE IN NEED OR BELIEVED TO BE IN NEED OF MEDICAL CARE TO SEEK APPROPRIATE CLINICAL PROFESSIONALS, AND TO WORK COLLABORATIVELY WITH HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND STATUTORY AGENCIES WHERE APPROPRIATE. D) BROADCASTING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION, TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE UNDERTAKING ACADEMIC RESEARCH, ABOUT A CHRISTIAN UNDERSTANDING OF DELIVERANCE MINISTRY; AND HOW INDIVIDUALS BELIEVING THEMSELVES OR OTHERS TO BE IN NEED OF DELIVERANCE MINISTRY MAY SEEK HELP AND ADVICE FROM THE CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
BUTT STREET
MINCHINHAMPTON
STROUD
GL6 9JP
- Phone:
- 01453 882289
- Email:
- father.howard@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window