UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS FOUNDATION UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to advance education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 16 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nell Axelrod | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|||||
MARKUS KAISER BAUMAN | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH VIVERITO | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geert GLAS | Trustee | 19 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pavlina Akritas | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Meinhart | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Usama Hajj | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES H MOORE | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DALTON GERARD DWYER | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MATHEWS | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE C DEVOCELLE | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.55k | £23.49k | £39.63k | £46.88k | £78.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.61k | £25.45k | £40.76k | £41.80k | £75.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 OCT 2016 as amended on 06 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS; AND (B) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ockenden International
Third Floor
20 Old Bailey
LONDON
EC4M 7AN
- Phone:
- 02075976000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window