ASD RAINBOWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASD Rainbows is registered with CIW and provides therapeutic intervention for children with autism or communication delay. We run nursery sessions for children aged 2-5 years, after school club for children aged 5-16 years, sibling support and parent/child sessions. To benefit the residents of Perthcelyn and the neighbourhood by providing activities/facilities to improve their conditions of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,961 from 5 government contract(s) and £22,529 from 7 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Caerphilly
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 30 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Toghill | Chair | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon McHugh | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ross Williams | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tamlin | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Phillips | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Toghill | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
HUW EVANS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
AILSA REYNOLDS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.57k | £241.27k | £183.15k | £175.63k | £193.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.92k | £177.22k | £184.84k | £164.08k | £222.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.87k | £191 | £14.10k | £23.78k | £32.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.72k | £29.35k | £4.89k | £68.41k | £22.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF ASD RAINBOWS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES BY: ? PROVIDING THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTION SESSIONS; ? PROVIDING CHILDREN WITH A SAFE STIMULATING PLAY ENVIRONMENT TO HELP ADDRESS ANY SENSORY/BEHAVIOUR CHALLENGES; ? LIAISING WITH MULTI-AGENCY PROFESSIONALS E.G. PSYCHOLOGIST, HEALTH VISITORS, OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS, SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPISTS AND SOCIAL WORKERS; ? PROVIDING ACCESS FOR PARENTS TO REGULAR WORKSHOPS RUN BY STAFF AND CONSULTANTS AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FURTHERANCE OF SAID OBJECTS ? TO OFFER EQUALITY TO ALL CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS REGARDLESS OF THEIR ABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, GENDER OR CULTURAL BACKGROUND, CLASS OR LANGUAGE ? THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERED BY ASD RAINBOWS WILL PRIMARILY BE RHONDDA CYNON TAFF BUT REQUESTS FROM FAMILIES OUTSIDE THIS AREA WILL NOT BE EXCLUDED ON THE CONDITION PARENTS/CARERS WILL TRANSPORT THEIR CHILD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Annex Building
Communities at work
Glamorgan Street
Perthcelyn
Mountain Ash
CF45 3RJ
- Phone:
- 01685 816359
- Email:
- enquiries@asdrainbows.co.uk
- Website:
-
asdrainbows.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window