PARENT LINE - OPUS (NORTH EAST)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 19 October 1979: Standard registration
- 11 April 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PARENTS ANONYMOUS (NORTH EAST) (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1979 AND 29 NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND MALTREATMENT OF INFANTS AND YOUNG CHILDREN BY PROVIDING SUCH SERVICE TO ASSIST AND ADVISE PARENTS AND OTHERS WHO ARE NEED OF SUCH HELP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY SHALL THINK FIT. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AMONG THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN BY DEVELOPING AND OFFERING PROGRAMMES OF ASSISTANCE TO PARENTS WHO ARE OR FEAR THEY MIGHT BECOME ACTIVELY ENGAGED IN ANY FORM OF PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL ABUSE TOWARDS THEIR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.