Financial history COPSALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1171081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.86k £119.75k £104.51k £19.35k £19.79k
Total expenditure £9.68k £105.72k £133.83k £30.10k £12.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.63k N/A N/A N/A