CLASSROOMS IN THE CLOUDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children in rural Nepal have few educational options; many work to support families. +70% of students don't complete grade 10. A registered NGO, CITCNepal, working closely with local communities, are dedicated to improving education, building good quality classrooms, sponsoring salaries of teachers and improving quality teaching and learning with training including first aid and menstrual health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nepal
Governance
- 02 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Joan Sixsmith | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Waller | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Owen | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Susan Roberts | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Glen Thomas | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE MCLAREN | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MIKE HAGEN | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DOROTHY HAGEN | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
DAWA GELJEN SHERPA | Trustee | 25 August 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.46k | £211.74k | £257.24k | £209.70k | £306.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.71k | £172.69k | £181.74k | £331.29k | £304.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 NOV 2016 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN NEPAL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY: ASSISTING IN THE BUILDING OF GOOD QUALITY SCHOOLS AND CLASSROOMS; SPONSORING TEACHERS AND SUPPORTING TEACHER TRAINING. SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Sandlea Park
West Kirby
WIRRAL
United Kingdom
CH48 0QF
- Phone:
- 07973157883
- Email:
- MIKE@CITCNEPAL.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window