CHESTERFIELD SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1170279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chesterfield Samaritans provides a listening service to those in emotional distress and despair.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £70,787
Total expenditure: £56,240

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gabrielle Vauclair Chair 15 January 2024
None on record
Jannette Ann Lynegar Trustee 06 July 2024
None on record
Kay Helen Dickinson Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Arthur David Maddox Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.63k £34.30k £13.72k £22.90k £70.79k
Total expenditure £21.63k £25.91k £27.35k £51.37k £56.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.72k £3.21k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JULY 1971 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 1992, 4 SEPTEMBER 2000, 21 FEBRUARY 2001, 14 MAY 2003 AND 4 APRIL 2006. AS AMENDED ON 17 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN CHESTERFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
CHESTERFIELD AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 14 October 1971 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
121 SALTERGATE
CHESTERFIELD
S40 1NH
Phone:
01246205613