HULL LGBT+ COMMUNITY PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pride in Hull delivers a large scale annual event in Hull aimed at promoting inclusion, community cohesion and raising awareness of issues affecting the LGBT+ community. The event consists of a large parade which offers creative opportunities in the weeks and months prior to the event to engage the local community in artistic projects. The main event consists of a large outdoor concert.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 22 November 2016: CIO registration
- HULL LGBT+ COMMUNITY PRIDE; Trading as Pride in Hull / Hull Pride (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Richard Train MStJ | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Sara Morton | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Pearson | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Gillyon-Powell | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Laura Toyne | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Innes | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.02k | £5.86k | £10.78k | £146.01k | £148.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.38k | £14.89k | £13.34k | £160.71k | £111.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2016 as amended on 27 Jan 2020 as amended on 21 May 2020 as amended on 20 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
1) To promote equality and diversity for the public benefit and, in particular, the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation and gender identity including, but not exclusively by: • raising the awareness of the public with regard to all aspects of discrimination in society, particularly issues and difficulties that are primarily related to sexual orientation and/or gender identity; • cultivating a sentiment in favour of equality and diversity in particular through celebrating the diversity of the LGBT+ community; • advancing education in equality and diversity whether by teaching, training, producing materials or offering support and expertise; • producing publications, lectures, media, public advocacy and other means of communication; • Support other LGBT+ organisations, initiatives and events through offering our experience and expertise or, in some cases, resources; • staging an annual LGBT+ festival; and 2) Such other objects as are charitable under the laws of England and Wales as the trustees shall at their absolute discretion determine. 3) The activities of the charity shall be undertaken in particular but not exclusively in Hull and the East Riding of Yorkshire (the areas of benefit).
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Smile Foundation
61 Queens Gardens
HULL
HU1 3AE
- Phone:
- 07725744239
- Email:
- info@prideinhull.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window