SUFFOLK ARCHIVES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SAF has launched a grassroots fundraising campaign, called Make your Mark, to provide funds for the Hold and wider archive-related projects. It has initiated a programme of teacher engagement, now run by Suffolk Archives, and is developing a fundraising and sponsorship strategy. It collaborates with other charities with a view to supporting both the Hold and Suffolk Archives in general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gray | Chair | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Elizabeth Riley | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
DAVID JAMES DAVIES | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £4.41k | £3.59k | £246 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £727 | £0 | £0 | £6.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MEANS OF GRANTS, HUMAN RESOURCES, EDUCATIONAL SERVICES, ADVOCACY AND ADVICE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE ARCHIVE SERVICE IN SUFFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 STRATFORD ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 6EF
- Phone:
- 01473 745167
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window