Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOOD SHEPHERD WITH ST. PETER, LEE
Charity Number: 1171429

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Hilborne | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Burns | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Stevens | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fran Lechler | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Bramson | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Frewin | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Grace | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Burns | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Watson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Tearle | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Johnson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James William Murdoch | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|||||
John Richard Murray | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAAN GOOSEN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CONWAY PHILLIP TEARLE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Bridget Shepherd | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.