Financial history YESHUA THE GREAT SHEPHERD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1174634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.00k £9.00k £6.00k £6.00k £5.40k
Total expenditure £8.00k £9.00k £6.00k £4.90k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A