Accounts and annual returns SAB

Charity number: 1171527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 December 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 December 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 13 January 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 13 January 2021 44 days late Download Open in new window