THE DYNAMIC GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising in connection with the charitable objects of supporting the facilitation and development of inclusive gymnastics for all in South East Northumberland, including pre-school age children, children with disabilities and schools gymnastics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLIE HODGSON | Chair | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Arries | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ANDERSON | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.32k | £8.43k | £17.18k | £45.41k | £47.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.49k | £14.58k | £16.41k | £13.68k | £12.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR GYMNASTICS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL GRANTS OR ASSISTANCE, AND/OR RELEVANT EQUIPMENT, AS DEEMED NECESSARY AND APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Kielder Avenue
CRAMLINGTON
NE23 8JT
- Phone:
- 01670739200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window