PETERBOROUGH RAPE CRISIS CARE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peterborough Rape Crisis provide safe, confidential support services for child and adult survivors of rape, sexual abuse and sexual violence regardless of when the abuse happened. Our services include trauma informed therapeutic support and advocacy. All services are free of charge and available to survivors in Peterborough and Cambridgeshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £411,048 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 03 January 2017: CIO registration
- PRCCG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Nicholls | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Marsh | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SYLVIA LATTEN-QUINN | Trustee | 05 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £622.71k | £490.74k | £507.46k | £736.70k | £425.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £670.76k | £337.04k | £472.86k | £594.21k | £622.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £727.59k | £411.05k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.68k | N/A | £4.17k | £9.12k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £613.02k | N/A | £503.29k | £727.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £670.76k | N/A | £472.86k | £594.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | £8.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jan 2017 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 26 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF WOMEN AND THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM THE RESULT OF SEXUAL ASSAULT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 1481
Peterborough
PE1 9XS
- Phone:
- 01733511250
- Email:
- admin@prccg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window