MAIDENHEAD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1170937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Community centre in central Maidenhead.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £96,742
Total expenditure: £91,031

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 January 2017: CIO registration
  • 10 August 2021: Funds received from 1177369 HEART CHURCH MAIDENHEAD
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HUGH EVANS Trustee 03 April 2023
None on record
Zenith Douglas Trustee 02 January 2023
None on record
JACK PETER DOUGLAS Trustee 23 December 2016
THE WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD ASSOCIATION FOR SOCIAL WORK
Received: On time
POOLE AND RINGS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SPOORE, MERRY AND RIXMAN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHARLES DAVIS TRUST
Received: On time
ST LUKES COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
SIMON CHAN Trustee 23 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.82k £14.42k £40.61k £82.12k £96.74k
Total expenditure £30.63k £18.99k £38.27k £79.94k £91.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2022 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 09 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 14 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Maidenhead Community Centre
4 Marlow Road
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 7HY
Phone:
07775990723