REACH OUT MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian organisation, who set out to help those in the church who are homeless and in addiction from Alcohol and Drugs. We found that people without faith where willing to come in to rehab, knowing that we have a Christian ethos. We do not discriminate against any one that wishes to come for help. We go on the streets of Middleborough, Sunderland and Newcastle helping all in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
Total income includes £179,630 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2017: CIO registration
- REACH OUT RECOVERY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Kelly | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Grosvenor | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.09k | £164.32k | £155.16k | £183.71k | £260.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.74k | £164.69k | £146.96k | £182.55k | £271.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £179.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 23 December 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 23 December 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 January 2021
(These accounts |
17 January 2022 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 18 January 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 January 2020
(These accounts |
18 January 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH; AND 3.1.2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF LACK OF ACCOMMODATION, ILL-HEALTH, ADDICTION, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE ALL THESE OBJECTS TO BE PURSUED IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES AND THE BASIS OF FAITH AND IN SUCH A WAY THAT DEMONSTRATES AND RECOMMENDS FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD, AND PARTICULARLY THE VALUES OF CARE AND CONCERN FOR THE NEEDY AND VULNERABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14-16 WHITBY STREET
HARTLEPOOL
TS24 7AD
- Phone:
- 01429420045
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window