WELLINGTON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide spiritualist church services, marriage and naming ceremonies, advice and help to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 22 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MADELENA FAITH | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
roy simpson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Florence Sheperd | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donna Maria Smith | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARGARET STRAUB | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.13k | £8.99k | £11.14k | £8.72k | £7.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.72k | £11.02k | £9.73k | £8.43k | £9.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 April 2022 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
REGENT STREET
WELLINGTON
TELFORD
TF1 1PQ
- Phone:
- 01952271399
- Email:
- Rachael0-8@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window