Financial history WITNEY AND WEST OXFORDSHIRE FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1170366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £58.32k £181.49k £61.31k £293.96k £311.25k
Total expenditure £40.85k £117.50k £46.66k £318.46k £218.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.58k £10.00k N/A