DONCASTER FOODBANK (TRUSSELL TRUST) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The distribution of a balanced food parcel which will last three days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 16 February 2017: Standard registration
- 28 February 2024: Funds received from 1179872 DONCASTER BUSINESS FOR THE COMMUNITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Taplin | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Dickson | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Hymans | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jordan | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Neil Riley | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|||||
William Mark Snelson | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.94k | £68.85k | £81.62k | £139.28k | £151.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.20k | £31.10k | £48.39k | £79.31k | £138.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
'THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN [INSERT AREA OF BENEFIT] AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES AND TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, SUPPORTED BY CHURCHES IN (AREA OF BENEFIT).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Doncaster Foodbank
Saica Natur
Sandal Stones Road
Kirk Sandal Industrial Estate
Doncaster
DN3 1TR
- Phone:
- 07568247288
- Website:
-
doncaster.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window