Trustees SHERBORNE MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1176535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUKE RUSSELL MOULAND Chair 05 January 2018
None on record
Christopher Farrington Trustee 07 January 2025
None on record
Karen Chapman Trustee 07 January 2025
None on record
Lucy Blackthorne Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Owen Young Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Kenneth George Barber Trustee 28 March 2023
None on record
Gareth Eifion Lewis Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
GRAHAM CHARLES BENDELL Trustee 16 February 2018
None on record
CELIA FREAR Trustee 05 January 2018
None on record