THE GROSVENOR PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the purposes of a park, exercise or playground for the use, enjoyment and recreation of the inhabitants and visitors of the city and borough of Chester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 03 December 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHESHIREWEST AND CHESTER COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.82k | £54.06k | £14.88k | £15.78k | £12.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.82k | £54.06k | £14.88k | £15.78k | £12.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.06k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 February 2024 | 749 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 February 2024 | 749 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2024 | 1114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 4 NOVEMBER 1867
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A PARK, EXERCISE OR PLAY-GROUND FOR THE USE, ENJOYMENT AND RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY AND BOROUGH OF CHESTER.
Area of benefit
CITY AND BOROUGH OF CHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheshire West & Chester Council
The Portal
Wellington Road
ELLESMERE PORT
CH65 0BA
- Phone:
- 01244977561
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window