Trustees HORNSEA DISTRICT LIONS CLUB
Charity number: 1171122

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Parry | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Richard henderson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Robinson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dennis Milne | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
linda Jackson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ELDRED | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRIGGS | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MELVILLE WATSON | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH BRIAN THORPE | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.