WHITSTABLE MARITIME LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WM aims to help residents, visitors, school children and students enjoy exploring the town's coastal connections-past, present and future, through the prism of maritime heritage, sustainable environment, education, the arts and economic growth. Currently to develop a Discovery Centre, renovate an Oyster Yawl, engage the public in an annual event and create an interactive coastal trail.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 10 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susannah Gooch | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Line | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Hare | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Steen | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Wright | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Walford | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN Fielding | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|||||
GEORGE BARRIE GREEN | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.73k | £33.00k | £6.04k | £1.70k | £7.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.77k | £10.00k | £7.58k | £2.99k | £27.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 APR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ABOUT THE MARITIME PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE OF WHITSTABLE THOUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF A MARITIME EDUCATION CENTRE AND THE RESTORATION OF HISTORIC VESSELS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horsebridge Centre
11 Horsebridge Road
Whitstable
Kent
CT5 1AF
- Phone:
- 07563020931
- Email:
- whitstablem@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window