Financial history Friends of Monmouth Prep School

Charity Number: 1170580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.56k £1.30k £1.66k £16.88k £14.04k
Total expenditure £8.29k £2.68k £1.35k £16.27k £13.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A