Governing document Friends of Monmouth Prep School
Charity number: 1170580

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2016 as amended on 06 Nov 2024 as amended on 26 Sept 2024 as amended on 01 May 2025
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the pupils of Monmouth Prep School by engaging in fundraising activities or providing experiences or equipment in order to: enrich the lives of pupils; build the community of parents, carers, staff and students; build relations with the local community and benefit relevant charities.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.