Trustees The Arts Society Totnes
Charity number: 1171682

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Robinson | Chair | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Gladys Page | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Roger Paul Sutcliffe | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stanny Post | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Hitchins | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Jane Ward | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROL EDITH CATHERINE WADDINGTON | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Mulder | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.