FRIENDS OF THOMAS A BECKET CHURCH FRAMFIELD

Charity number: 1173493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Repair maintenance and improvement of fabric of St Thomas a Becket Church Framfield East Sussex

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £545
Total expenditure: £750

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER JOHN BERRY Chair 23 January 2017
None on record
JOHN ANDREW CHARLES MORDAUNT Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
MRS PAT HERBERT Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
DIXON RANDAL PRESS Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
ANN ELIZABETH NEWTON Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
MRS MAGGY WEST Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
MR PAUL WRIGHT Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
ANN ELIZABETH PRESS Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.73k £1.13k £300 £568 £545
Total expenditure £10.74k £0 £0 £0 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 April 2022 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tickerage Farm
Tickerage Lane
Blackboys
UCKFIELD
TN22 5LU
Phone:
01892890400
Website:

No information available