NORTH WEST WALES SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1170372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

North West Wales Samaritans, Bangor offer a confidential, non-judgmental listening service to people in distress 24 hours a day, every day of the year. Samaritans may be contacted by phone, email or text message. We offer a Welsh language service at specified hours. Our aim is to lessen the number of people taking their own lives but our service is open to everyone in distress.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £48,487
Total expenditure: £44,681

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy
  • Gwynedd
  • Isle Of Anglesey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SAMARIAID GOGLEDD GORLLEWIN CYMRU (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alastair Langdon Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Janet Lowe Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Peter Edward Rendle Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Ann Catherine Evans Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
TUDUR OWEN WILLIAMS Trustee 19 July 2023
CYFEILLION ELLIS WYNNE
Received: On time
Linda Helen Brookes-Fazakerley Trustee 22 July 2022
None on record
Sian Bowen Beidas Trustee 22 July 2022
None on record
Linda Jane Macdonald Trustee 29 July 2021
None on record
Gillian Elisabeth Hubbard Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
Lynda Price Jones Trustee 30 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.28k £33.05k £20.05k £18.89k £48.49k
Total expenditure £41.59k £34.50k £30.82k £40.82k £44.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.50k
Income from government grants £1.50k £17.72k £1.50k £2.50k £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DECEMBER 1984 AMENDED 18 MAY 1987, 23 MAY 1988, 20 MAY 1991, 17 FEBRUARY 2005, 1 JUNE 2007 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN NORTH WEST WALES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITH SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS TO THE AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS; AND 2. TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST WALES
Registration history
  • 09 September 1985 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Samaritans
Unit 5
Llys Onnen
Ffordd y Llyn
Parc Menai
BANGOR
Phone:
01248 674984