MIDSOMER NORTON TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a custodian of key community assets in Midsomer Norton. Maintained and available for local beneficiaries i.e residents of Midsomer Norton and the area to enjoy. It includes key community buildings and spaces from Bath & NE Somerset & Midsomer Norton Town Council gifted to the trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIDSOMER NORTON TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.32k | £26.56k | £25.50k | £25.60k | £375 | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.90k | £8.86k | £24.89k | £28.82k | £21.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.32k | £25.00k | £25.00k | £20.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 December 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 December 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1 THE PROVISION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDSOMER NORTON IN SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDSOMER NORTON IN SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEE MAY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDSOMER NORTON IN SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MIDSOMER NORTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Town Hall
The Island
Midsomer Norton
Radstock
BA3 2HQ
- Phone:
- 01761418701
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window