Financial history NATIONAL MILITARY WORKING DOG MEMORIAL UK

Charity Number: 1173384
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.52k £16.30k £22.55k £20.55k £28.12k
Total expenditure £1.98k £1.56k £1.32k £637 £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A