MINDFUL MUSIC LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting children in the development of self-control for greater wellbeing, using mindfulness and music: -Running training sessions for music teachers and primary school teachers -Delivering workshops for children attending public events and schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Blackpool
- Manchester City
- Medway
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 April 2017: Standard registration
- 29 April 2021: Funds received from 1147898 HORSESHOES AND HANDPRINTS
- MINDFUL MUSIC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN PRECEY | Chair | 18 July 2016 |
|
|||||
James Little | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Edwards | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £7.29k | £3.42k | £4.67k | £2.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £2.48k | £3.92k | £4.77k | £3.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 APR 2017
Charitable objects
2.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND RESEARCH OF MINDFULNESS AND MUSIC, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN EDUCATIONAL SETTINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Heathdene Road
Streatham
LONDON
SW16 3PD
- Phone:
- 07979150697
- Email:
- mindfulmusicmartha@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window