Financial history PORT CARLISLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 509226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.16k £6.62k £90 £2.09k £1.69k
Total expenditure £876 £1.59k £1.80k £1.78k £699
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A