BLEVINS FRANKS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance such charitable purposes according to the law of England and Wales. The foundation aims to provide donations for small local causes within the locality of the Blevins Franks Group's offices in the UK and across Europe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cyprus
- France
- Malta
- Monaco
- Portugal
- Spain
Governance
- 30 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA LISA BORG | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Orwell | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HOWARD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.47k | £31.43k | £48.27k | £46.28k | £48.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.68k | £37.32k | £70.56k | £48.48k | £33.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLEVINS FRANKS LTD
28 ST. JAMES'S SQUARE
LONDON
SW1Y 4JH
- Phone:
- 02073895227
- Email:
- foundation@blevinsfranks.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window