SWADLINCOTE FESTIVAL OF TRANSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Events for the Community, The Charities organises transport based events for public enjoyment. The money raised at these events is for local groups, individuals and local charities to apply for.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Coe | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lyndsay Thomson | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sebastian David Coe | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
KIM ANGELA COE | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30k | £1.50k | £2.11k | £1.60k | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £737 | £593 | £2.94k | £1.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME (THAT ARE CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) IN PARTICULAR BY RAISING MONEY FOR LOCAL CHARITIES THROUGH HOLDING VEHICLE FESTIVAL EVENTS. THROUGH: PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SWADLINCOTE AND DISTRICT AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS. TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE PEOPLE OF ALL ABILITIES TO COME TOGETHER ON EQUAL TERMS, TO ENJOY ACTIVITIES THAT WILL ENABLE THE CHARITY TRUSTEES TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY; ORGANISING, PROMOTING AND MANAGING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION THROUGH CULTURAL, AMATEUR SPORT AND ARTS ACTIVITIES ALL WITH THE AIM TO ACHIEVE THE CIO CHARITABLE PURPOSES. OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPTION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE IN THE AREA TO BENEFIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH (SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005) AND (SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND 2008).
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Hartshill Road
Hartshorne
SWADLINCOTE
Derbyshire
DE11 7HN
- Phone:
- 07850666125
- Email:
- swadfest@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window