AWAKEN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awaken Church Provides training and education, Youth Clubs, Feed the homeless and provide practical necessities to the homeless and Social Activities for marriages, singles parents, and children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RYAN JOHNSON | Chair | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mutombo Emmanuel Kankunku | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Harrison | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE SAMANTHA JOHNSON | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/08/2018 | 07/08/2019 | 07/08/2020 | 07/08/2021 | 07/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.11k | £57.75k | £47.18k | £24.90k | £29.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.77k | £62.78k | £48.45k | £30.92k | £29.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 339 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 339 days | |
Annual return | 07 August 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 198 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 August 2019 | 16 October 2020 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2019 | 27 October 2020 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN HOCKLEY, BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Awaken Church
38 Smith Street
BIRMINGHAM
B19 3EN
- Phone:
- 01214486166
- Email:
- admin@awakenchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window