Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WYCHBOLD FIRST & NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1170865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 September 2023 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required