THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY GREASLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses etc Taking of religious assemblies in schools Promoting Christianity through the staging of events and distribution of literature Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 March 2017: Standard registration
- GREASLEY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Arthur Pickworth | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Neil Roger Taylor | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Timby | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fletcher | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Kirby | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Stanton | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Lilian Jackson | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Fletcher | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Coleman | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER STANTON | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WHEELER | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.24k | £146.15k | £106.16k | £112.34k | £114.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.31k | £112.77k | £102.09k | £72.32k | £93.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2024 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2024 | 271 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greasley Church Hall
Church Road
Greasley
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 2AB
- Phone:
- 01773 719941
- Website:
-
greasleychurch.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window