Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY GREASLEY
Charity number: 1172273
Up to date (271 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Arthur Pickworth | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Roger Taylor | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Timby | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fletcher | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Kirby | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Stanton | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Lilian Jackson | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Fletcher | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Coleman | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER STANTON | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WHEELER | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.