'THE GLOBE' COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a community library service and information hub for the benefits of the local community and provides a venue for facilitating community activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MICHAEL HEGGARTY | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Craster Claire | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rudolf William Bilous Rudy | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally ElizabethAtkinson Sally | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Allison McGill Jane | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Edward King Jeff | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Judith Kitching | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHANDLER | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|||||
ROBERT EDWARD ROBERTS | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.92k | £3.85k | £7.59k | £12.97k | £15.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £3.72k | £6.45k | £12.88k | £12.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £82 | N/A | £1.10k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 April 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 April 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY AND INFORMATION HUB FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF STOKESLEY AND NORTH YORKSHIRE WIDE, AND FOR FACILITATING COMMUNITY ACTIVITY. THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE THAT SERVICE WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF GENDER, AGE DISABILITY OR OTHER PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stokesley Community Library
Town Close
North Road
Stokesley
MIDDLESBROUGH
Clevelan
- Phone:
- 01609533461
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window