Financial history SAVING ABANDONED FLY-GRAZING EQUINES

Charity number: 1172769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/05/2020 05/05/2021 05/05/2022 05/05/2023 05/05/2024
Total gross income £64.96k £99.40k £121.31k £119.95k £138.51k
Total expenditure £66.61k £90.47k £130.19k £112.36k £139.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A